Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with STONE, WILLIAM F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, WILLIAM F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PLAINTIFF RE REQUIRED REPORTING | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: CAMPER, CHAD D SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021 CA 002622 F, FERNANDEZ, ANTHONY VS. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: OPR-10/27/2021 | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021035013 | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE STONE, WILLIAM F: ASSIGNED | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 08/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002622 F | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: CAMPER, CHAD D SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021 CA 002622 F, FERNANDEZ, ANTHONY VS. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-8/17/2021 | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.