Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with STONE, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - RECORDED (OR.3631.4365. / 3563247) | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT RESULT: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/11/2022 AT 9:00 AM - COURT EVENT DISPOSED | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT RESULT: JURY PRETRIAL SET FOR 03/13/2023 AT 9:00 AM - CANCELLED | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT RESULT: CIVIL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/01/2023 AT 8:30 AM - CANCELLED | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION STATUS REPORT - SETTLED | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | JURY PRETRIAL SET FOR 03/13/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: BROWN, JOHN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.