Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with BROWN, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBROWN, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategorySummary Admistration > $1,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER: SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.3520.498. / 3423800) | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER: SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD REAL ESTATE | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2020048938 | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/22/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CP 001775 F | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.