Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts with BROWN, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBROWN, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategorySummary Admistration > $1,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | STATUS REPORT | |
July 09, 2023 | Docket Event | STATUS REPORT | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM - ASCENSION SACRED HEART HOSPITAL | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE - RECORDED (OR.3613.2401. / 3538699) | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (CYNTHIA CHAFFEE) | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR ROO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.