Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dugger, Linda Gayle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dugger, James Robert J, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with LESTER BASS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLESTER BASS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: OSH JAMES DUGGER | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JAMES DRUGGER 9/22/22 | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: OSH LINDA DUGGER | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DV TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DV ORDER SET HRNG TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DV ORDER SETTING HEARING: 9/29/22 8:30AM | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 452022DR000803DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/16/2022 | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Event DV scheduled on 9/29/2022 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge LESTER BASS presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.