Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Garry-Bell, Arianna Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERSON, ERIC CHASE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00 | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $9.00 Receipt Number YX 216462 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | FDLE NAME CHANGE REPORT | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FJ- VITAL STATISTICS | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT NAME CHANGE | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 11/22/2022 AT 9:30 AM VIA ZOOM | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINT REPORT | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 452022DR000774DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/8/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.