Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Gammon, Cynthia Lorraine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chestnut, Nolan Todd Augustus, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with BASS, LESTER BERNARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBASS, LESTER BERNARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $3.00 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $3.00 Receipt Number YX 218513 | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF CHILD SUPPORT PURGE | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER- RECORD GRANTING MOTION TO ENFORCE SUPPORT ORDER | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION: TO ENFORCE SUPPORT ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CS COURT scheduled on 6/13/2023 at 1245 PM, YX - Judge OFFICER HEARING presiding. | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Reopened for REOPEN CIV CONTEMPT AND ENFORCE on 6/8/2023 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.