Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fernandez, Kevin Noel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sparkman Fernandez, Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with BASS, LESTER BERNARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBASS, LESTER BERNARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: FINAL 09/15/2022 1:15PM VIA ZOOM | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: FINAL 09/15/22 01:30 PM VIA ZOOM | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION: ASHLEY FERNANDEZ | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION: KEVIN FERNANDEZ | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 200234 | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 452022DR000645DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/27/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.