Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Blue, Leonard Alexander, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERSON, ERIC CHASE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $3.00 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $3.00 Receipt Number YX 203888 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $9.00 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $9.00 Receipt Number YX 203890 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FJ- VITAL STATISTICS | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: VITAL STATISTICS | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FDLE NAME CHANGE REPORT | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT NAME CHANGE | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE: LEONARD ALEXANDER BLUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.