Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bankunited N A, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Hooper, Jessica Ariel, Kopf, Jennifer Lynn, against Clinch, Charlettia L, In Possession I, Unknown Parti, Of Charlettia L Clinch, Unknow, United States Of America Actin, Unknown Parties In Possession, (total of 5) See All represented by Rudy, John Forney, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERSON, ERIC CHASE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
COVER SHEET
Date: September 22, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: September 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- RECORD | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE: OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: 02/27/23 09:30 AM VIA ZOOM | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE: CHARLETTIA L. CLINCH | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: ORDER SETTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A NON-JURY TRIAL IN A STREAMLINED CASE | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CHARLETTIA L. CLINCH A/K/A CHARLETTIA CLINCH 11/12/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.