Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Quail Creek Plantation, Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Dollinger, Jeffrey Ross, against Bryceville Minerals, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERSON, ERIC CHASE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
COVER SHEET
Date: September 14, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2022EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: ALL ON SERVICE LIST | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: ALL ON SERVICE LIST | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCE CHECK REQUEST-DOC STAMP | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $207.40 | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $74.07 Receipt Number YX 220799 | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | BID SHEET | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: ALL ON SERVICE LIST | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.