Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Circuit Civil 37-D case represented by Merritt, Keith P., against Karasik, John, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERSON, ERIC CHASE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
COVER SHEET
Date: September 06, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN KARASIK A/K/A JOHN F. KARASIK
Date: September 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR REFORMATION OF MORTGAGE-PLAINTIFF'S | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number YX 202205 | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 452022CA000282CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022 | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00 | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN KARASIK A/K/A JOHN F. KARASIK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.