Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kaikkonen, Karen, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case represented by Sarris, Gust G, against Jasinsky, Bruce A, represented by Osgathorpe, John David, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED: | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ISSUED: AMENDED KAREN KAIKKONEN | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ISSUED: KAREN KAIKKONEN | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | EMAIL: FR L. DRIGGERS | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Active Process WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONTEMPT | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | EMAIL:L DRIGGERS TO JA N BEASLEY | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE:040218 9AM | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 032318 10AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.