Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Clark, Anthony, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Owens, Donny Allen, against Pasek, Edward L., Usa Truck Inc., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET: NOTICE OF HEARING 2/26/20 @ 9:30AM | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE: OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
January 21, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST: COPIES | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST: FOR COPIES | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION: | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | EMAIL: TAMMY GURGANUS | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: ELLIS T FERNANDEZ III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.