Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mitchell, Jill Peterson, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case represented by Dearing, Katie L, against Peterson, Gregory, Eternity Funeral Home And Crem, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | CLOSING DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: 013017 KATIE DEARING | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT: ETERNITY FUNERAL HOME AND CREMATUIONS OF NASSAU | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: 123016 KATIE DEARING | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT: ORIGINAL | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.