Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Legge, Ana, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Azoy, Ralph, against American Strategic Insurance C, represented by Scheihing, Michaela Denise, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2016 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: DEPOSOTION | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: ANA LEGGE 10/18/17 @ 1PM | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: HEARING | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY RESPONSE ANNA LEGGE | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING 060617 330PM | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: 2ND GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.