Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Douglas, Vivienne, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Black, David Richard, against All American Carpet Care & Sal, Billy Casper Golf, Llc, Hawkins, Nikki Elizabeth, represented by Dore, Dennis Patrick, Gardner, Leonard Levi, Hawkins, Nikki, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence Premises Liab Comm |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $11.00 Receipt Number YX 152744 | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $11.00 | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | CLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: LEVI GARDNER | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: FR DAVID BLACK | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: DEPOSITION | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL 2ND AMENDED ORD SETTING WEEK OF 091018 | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE: : OF MEDIATION ATTENDANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.