Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case represented by Tomchin, Kenneth Allen, against Uneta Inc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT: IN SUPPORT | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFAULT: UNETA INC | |
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED | |
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY | |
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: AFFIDAVIT OF KENNETH TOMCHIN OF DILIGENT SEARCH FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.