Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Americredit Financial Services, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Grice, Sharon D, Grice, Perry D, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2016 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | CLOSING FINAL ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER: PERRY GRICE AND SHARON GRICE | |
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SHARON GRICE 092316 | |
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PERRY GRICE 092316 | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER | |
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED:PERRY GRICE | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED:SHARON GRICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.