Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Grace Title, Inc., filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Hughes, Douglas Bradford, against Navy Federal Credit Union, Old Republic National Title In, Westchester Fire Insurance Com, represented by Criscuolo, Matthew B, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF REMOVAL | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER: TO PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE | |
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED:NAVY FEDERAL C U | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED:OLD REPUBLIC TITLE | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED:WESTCHESTER FIRE INS CO | |
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $430.00 Receipt Number YX 89650 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.