Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brown, Maria, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against American Renal Associates Dba, represented by Gillette, Charlie James, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence Premises Liab Comm |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | EMAIL: TO ASHLEY STRICKLAND FROM MELISSA DRAPER | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS: DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE: SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE: NON OBJECTION | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE: PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE: PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.