Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavanaugh, Shelly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rutledge, Randall, against Taylor, Joshua, Wall Timber Products, Inc., represented by Schrader, Kristie Renee, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY RESPONSE | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY RESPONSE | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY RESPONSE | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.