Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Seda Construction Company, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Franson, Albert Todd, against Nassau County, Florida, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with Steven M. Fahlgren presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven M. Fahlgren Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2016 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Event NPD scheduled on 1/12/2018 at 0100 PM, YX - Judge STEVEN FAHLGREN presiding. | |
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE/MOTION FOR PROP DISMISSAL AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE ANSWER AND WAIVER OF APP | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 80135 | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED:A. FRANSON ESQ | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 79920 | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.