Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wade, Peter, Weiss, Robert, Us Finance Group, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Cappiello, Paul Joseph, against Guerrero, Marco, Andesco Construction Services,, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2016 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DEFAULT ANDESCO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT NOT ENTERED ON ANDESCO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES AS WE HAVE NOT RECEIVED A RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON THIS PARTY. | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE:A CVERCKO ESQ | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO WITHDRAW | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARCO GUERRERO 022018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.