Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Browne, Gay K, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Florida Fam Bureau General Ins, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2013 |
CategoryOther Civil Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF HEARING 3/23/15 2PM | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE: OF AUTHORITY | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE: OF AUTHORITY | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.