Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bitteker, Dennis, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case against Department Of Highway Safety A, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2013 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge: FAHLGREN , STEVEN M Assigned | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: SOUD , ADRIAN G Assigned | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | BY ORDER OF COURT FROM DCA | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | OPINION | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | MANDATE FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE: TO CLERK FROM DCA 12 2 2014 | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | BY ORDER OF COURT FROM DCA | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE: TO RESP TO PETITION | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION: FOR ORAL ARGUMENT | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: 081814 J BLANTON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.