Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
L&W Supply Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Omni Amelia Island, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2013 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: HEARING | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: DEPOS | |
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: DEPOS | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: ROSSVD MANHATTAN CONSTRUCTION 021814 | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED: NOTD | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: AFF OF SVC OF SUBP | |
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MANHATTAN CONSTRUCTION 020514 | |
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED: NTC OF PROD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.