Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Florida Dept Of Transportation, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against John M. Drew, Nassau County Ta, Braddock'S Inc, A Florida Corp, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2013 |
CategoryEminent Domain |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | FINANCE REFUND REQUEST: YX88922 122,587.50 | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $122,587.50 Receipt Number YX 88922 | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $122,587.50 | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST | |
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL 4/18/16 9:30 AM JS 4/15/16 10:00 AM PT 4/5/16 3:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.