Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
City Of Fernandina Beach, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bach, Tammi E., against Columbia Cascade Company, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2013 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge: FAHLGREN , STEVEN M Assigned | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: SOUD , ADRIAN G Assigned | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Judge: BASS , SUZANNE Assigned | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT: | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FORM | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 23496 | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Judge: DAVIS , BRIAN J Assigned | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Case 452013CA000479CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/15/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.