Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Westling, Dale G, Lauren, Lindsay, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Westling, Dale Gregory, against Darlington, John J, Custom Creations & Restoration, represented by Benchimol, Daniel S., Cobb, Christopher Michael, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2013 |
CategoryNegligence Business Torts |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | NON CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE: NOTICE OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT OR PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER: DEF JOHN DARLINGTON | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: J DARLINGTON 101615 | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN DARLINGTON | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 73308 | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.