Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rimes, William, Rimes, Sherry, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against First Floridian Auto And Home, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2013 |
CategoryOther Civil Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Judge: SOUD , ADRIAN G Assigned | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST: FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: EXPERT WITNESS LIST | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL TD 12/15/14 9:30 AM PT 12/4/14 10:00 AM JS 12/12/14 10:00 AM | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Judge: BASS , SUZANNE Assigned | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET: TRIAL | |
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | NON CLOSING ORDER: REFERRING CASE TO CIVIL DIVISION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.