Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Katzer, Zachary Alan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against First Coast Railroad, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $4.00 | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $4.00 Receipt Number YX 123734 | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge: FAHLGREN , STEVEN M Assigned | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: SOUD , ADRIAN G Assigned | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED: NOTD | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE: TO REQ FOR COPIES | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | AMENDED: NOTD | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.