Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nantz, Cynthia, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Staggard, Richard Arthur, against Burbank Trawl Makers Inc, Burbank, William Hunter Iii, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2013 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE: SERVING W BURBANK III'S 2ND PROPOSAL | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE: SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE: OF CERTIF OF AUTH FOR MEDIATION | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE: NON OBJECTION | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES: | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE: OF NON OBJECTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.