Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Powers, Lalah, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mccranie, Daniel Irvine, against State Farm Mutual Automobile I, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2013 |
CategoryOther Civil Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE: OF ATTENDANCE | |
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA SERVED: BAPTIST MEDICAL 040513 | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA SERVED: BAPTIST MEDICAL 040813 NASSAU | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES: | |
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.