Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gray Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Griffin, Adam Denver, against Bright, David E, B And B Duval Companies Inc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2012 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | FINANCE REFUND REQUEST:YX 12505 200.00 | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NON CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT:JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: SOUD , ADRIAN G Assigned | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Reopened for REOPEN OTHER on 2/17/2015 | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: WELLS FARGO BANK 121514 | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE: OF GARNISHMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.