Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hodges, Cecil Derrick, Hodges, Polly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Harrell, Renee Daigle, against Otis Elevator Company, Purvis, Travis, United Technologies Coporation, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Judge: BASS , SUZANNE Assigned | |
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE:OF AUTHORITY FOR OTIS ELEVATOR | |
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE: | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION: FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.