Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rosendale, Allen D, Smith, Courtney D, Rosendale, Deborah A, Smith, George H Jr, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Sorenson, Charles Anthony, against Auffenberg Ford North Inc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2010 |
CategoryNegligence Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | CLS: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | MTN: MOTION PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | MOT: MOTION TO DISMISS | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN | |
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | ASM: SUMMONS ISSUED CA DR | |
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT OPEN | |
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event | OPN: COMPLAINT | |
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.