Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Duprey, Kathleen, Duprey, Robert, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Griffin, Lee Theodore, against Amelia Island Plantation Commu, Badenhoop, John C, Performance Multisports, represented by Eikner, Tod Bayard, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2010 |
CategoryNegligence Premises Liab Comm |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION: FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: C WINICKI 4813 | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | CLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION: | |
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: | |
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: | |
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE: OF INTENT | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST: FOR PROD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.