Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dunwody, James, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Dunlap, David Marcus, against Florida Peninsula Insurance Co, represented by Hawes, Trevor George, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2010 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION NON CLOSING | |
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event | CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL REC | |
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event | ORD: ORDER ON MOTION(S) | |
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | NOT: OF CANCELLATION | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event | FIL: STATEMENT | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.