Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Meahl, Richard, Meahl, Cynthia, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Romanello, Duane Charles, against Universal Property And Casualt, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2010 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF:DISMISSAL | |
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED SUBPOENA | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOT: PRODUCTION NON-PARTY | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SUBPOENA | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SUBPOENA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.