Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Spell, Rosa, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Carr, Patrick A, against Excursions Unlimited Inc, City Of Fernandina Beach, represented by Sarber, Lloyd Johnson, Dietzen, Leonard Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2009 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED: NOTD | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: SOUD , ADRIAN G Assigned | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE: COMPLIANCE | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION: STIPULATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.