Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Frack, Jean Marie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cleary, Scott Alan, against Nassau County School Board, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insuran, represented by Schrader, Kristie Renee, Schutt, Dennis Robert, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2009 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: DISMISSAL NON CLOSIN | |
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CLS: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: OF CANCELLATION | |
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: OF APPEARANCE | |
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | WITNESS/EXPERT WITNESS LIST | |
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE | |
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.