Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Adkins Electric Inc, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case against Safe Harbour Self Storage Llc, Haven Trust Bank Of Florida, Eagle Development Inc Of Ferna, represented by Post, James Harry, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2009 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK: KASS SHULER | |
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CLS: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | MOT: MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SUMMONS/RTD | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event | ASM: COPIES CICV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.