Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of Florida Department Of, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Maxon, Ralph Peerce, against Daniel, Jonathan Jones, Citizens State Bank, Mutt Daniel Properties Llc, Drew, John M, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2009 |
CategoryEminent Domain |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | COPY FILED | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT NON CLOSING | |
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event | MTN: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | NON CLS: ORDER | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | CLS: CLOSED REOPEN | |
December 03, 2009 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT REOPENED | |
December 03, 2009 | Docket Event | RPN: MOTION AFTER DISPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.