Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Waller, Judith A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nicol, Gordon Thomas, against J And W Contracting Inc, Williams, James Kemp, represented by Bigman, Jeffrey Errol, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2009 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL REC | |
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION NON CLOSING | |
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event | MTN: MOTION | |
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: OF SERVICE | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | REQ FOR PRODUCTION/TO PRODUCE | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: OF SERVICE | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO RQST/PRODUCTION | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | REQ FOR PRODUCTION/TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.