Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Atlantic Coast Bank, Edgefield Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Andre, Tony, Horne, Mark Jeffrey, against Bent Oaks Plantation Llc, Mann, Sean D, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, Nassau County Florida, Rushing, James R, (total of 5) See All represented by Cherneski, John Curtis Wade, Mydock, Kimberly Tolland, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2009 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT:AGREED ORDER DISSOLVING WRITS OF GARNISHMENT | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER:AGREED ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: SOUD , ADRIAN G Assigned | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment received: $38.00 Receipt Number YX 65279 | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 2122106 assessed at sum $17.00 | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: NOTD | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Reopened for REOPEN OTHER on 5/29/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.