Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dunes Club Villas Owners Assoc, Gideon, Cecile, Gideon, C J, Ramsey, E Stephen, Ramsey, Lucille M, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Whelan, Edward M., against Hardaway Construction Corp, Hardwick, James O, Kbj Architects Inc, Landsouth Construction Llc, represented by Mueller, Christopher John, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2009 |
CategoryCondominium |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge: FAHLGREN , STEVEN M Assigned | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: SOUD , ADRIAN G Assigned | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 2101902 assessed at sum $29.00 | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Payment received: $29.00 Receipt Number YX 50518 | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Judge: BASS , SUZANNE Assigned | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL : OF LIS PENDENS | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | NOT: DISMISSAL NON CLOSIN | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | NOT: DISMISSAL NON CLOSIN | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION NON CLOSING | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | MTN: MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.