Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
First Coast Community Bank, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case represented by Pinkstaff, Tiffiny Douglas, against Horton, Cynthia, Brightstar Llc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2009 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | MOT: MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NON CLS: ORDER | |
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | AFF: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.