Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eason, John, Eason, Margie, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Schuler, Carl Scott, against Walmart Stores Inc, represented by Schuler, Carl Scott, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2009 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL REC | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION NON CLOSING | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: ANSWERING INTERROGATORY | |
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event | ORD: ORDER SUBSTITUTING | |
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: OF CANCELLATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.