Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Compass Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brock, Frederick Rodney, against Loftis-Vrooman, Linda K, Loftis Construction Corp, represented by Jacobs, Arthur Ivan, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2009 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | ASM: EXEMPLIFIED COPIES | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | ASM: COPIES CICV | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | ORD: DENYING MOTION | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | CLS: CLOSED REOPEN | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ASM: COPIES CICV | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ASM: CERTIFY/COPIES CICV | |
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | RPN: MOTION AFTER DISPOSITION | |
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: OF APPEARANCE | |
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | ASM: COPIES CICV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.